RESPECT FOR ALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Respect for All works in Greater Manchester to enhance the mental and physical health of learning-disabled people, autistic people and their families and carers by providing a specialist counselling service. We also aim to educate the public about issues faced by learning disabled people, autistic people and their carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £141,150 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 01 April 2020: CIO registration
- 08 February 2022: Funds received from 1129953 RESPECT FOR ALL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Jane Gay | Chair | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Abernethy | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayson Haynes | Trustee | 27 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Ashcroft | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shirley Wood-Gallagher | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Molete | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Priscilla Akua Asirifi | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chinagorom Eric Irozuru | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET MARIANNE WALKER | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.66k | £314.72k | £324.68k | £425.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.76k | £227.80k | £315.78k | £488.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £180.39k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £85.50k | £127.33k | £112.61k | £141.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF LEARNING-DISABLED PEOPLE, AUTISTIC PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY PROVIDING A COUNSELLING SERVICE AND OTHER FORMS OF SUPPORT. 2. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT ISSUES FACED BY LEARNING DISABLED PEOPLE, AUTISTIC PEOPLE AND THEIR CARERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Town Hall
5 Irwell Place
Eccles
MANCHESTER
M30 0FN
- Phone:
- 01615324070
- Email:
- info@respectforall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window