CAFE NEURO YORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cafe Neuro York is a way for people with long-term neurological conditions to meet in a relaxed and supportinve environment. The charity aims to provide psychological and social support for anyone with or affected by a neurological condition. We offer online and offline (when we can) opportunities for people to meet up, running weekly Zoom sessinos and monthly day time and evening cafes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 30 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diana Rosemary Toseland | Chair | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Hunter | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Wyn Bevan | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David King | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penney Mayall | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Stockdale Miss | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02k | £121 | £4.14k | £1.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £2.84k | £1.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF LONG TERM NEUROLOGICAL CONDITION OR RELATED DISADVANTAGE IN YORK AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SOCIAL INCLUSION, ENGAGEMENT, WELLBEING, LEARNING, PEER SUPPORT AND CREATIVITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o Sintons LLP
14 Tower House Business Centre
Fishergate
York
YO10 4UA
YO10 4UA
- Phone:
- 07707708244
- Email:
- cafeneuroyork@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window