HOPTON COMMUNITY HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A community venue
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 13 March 2020: CIO registration
- HOPTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul John Lamond | Chair | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Ramster | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Blackmore | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bennett | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.34k | £13.73k | £2.08k | £3.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.56k | £2.08k | £2.35k | £3.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.77k | £11.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2025 | 378 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2025 | 378 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2025 | 735 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2025 | 735 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 May 2023 | 464 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 May 2023 | 464 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HOPTON AND COTON PARISH AND SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hopton Village Hall
Wilmore Hill Lane
Hopton
STAFFORD
ST18 0AW
- Phone:
- 07958665906
- Email:
- john1rogers@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window