CHRISTIAN LIFE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the Christian religion, mainly but not exclusively, by means of preaching and teaching; and to relieve the needs of people living, primarily but not exclusively, in the city of Hereford and the former county of Hereford by reason of their economic and/or social circumstance. The charity operates as a church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 15 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Lowther | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Esther Ruth Rudge | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kanute Kindamba | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Martin Farkas | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £214.73k | £239.63k | £254.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £170.44k | £238.09k | £229.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.62k | £6.72k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 4.1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF PREACHING AND TEACHING; AND 4.2. TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR ECONOMIC AND/OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCE LIVING, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE CITY OF HEREFORD AND THE FORMER COUNTY OF HEREFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christian Life Centre
133 Edgar Street
HEREFORD
HR4 9JR
- Phone:
- 01432271071
- Email:
- admin@clch.cc
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window