AL-MAHDI ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACTIVITIES TO SUPPORT EDUCATION AND CULTURAL FACILITIES FOR LOCAL PEOPLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 March 2020: Standard registration
- AL - MAHDI FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAN ALI AHSAN HOSINE | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED QADIR REZAEI | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
MUKHTAR PARVEEZI | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
KHALEQDAD AKBARI | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
TAQI IBRAHIMI | Trustee | 29 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED NABE ANWARZADAH | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
ISMAIL IBRAHIMI | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.20k | £5.30k | £3.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.33k | £4.99k | £9.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 07 June 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 JUL 2017 as amended on 07 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE AFGHANISTAN RESIDENTS OF LEICESTER WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 GUTHRIDGE CRESCENT
LEICESTER
LEICESTER
LE3 1JX
- Phone:
- 0877667275
- Email:
- MOHAMMEDMR41@YAHOO.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window