THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STRELLEY ALL SAINTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC of All Saints Strelley has the mission of Sharing God's love in Strelley village and it's surrounding area. The main activity of the PCC is promoting in the parish the whole mission of the Church. The mission of the Church is to carry forward the work begun by Jesus Christ in all aspects of the life of people in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £275 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 16 January 2020: Standard registration
- The PCC of Strelley All Saints (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BILBOROUGH AND STRELLEY NOTTINGHAM (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Timothy Kenneth Atkinson | Chair | 29 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Ian Cameron | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Laura Elizabeth Ward | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael Norman Walters | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Clifford | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Hallam | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Lilian Walker | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Kathleen Marian Henshell | Trustee | 25 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.41k | £151.69k | £135.34k | £171.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.25k | £146.60k | £153.92k | £113.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £450 | £3.72k | £275 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957 as amended on 20 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARGARETS CHURCH
ASPLEY LANE
NOTTINGHAM
NG8 5GE
- Phone:
- 01159298899
- Email:
- office@wearewoven.church
- Website:
-
wearewoven.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window