YORKSHIRE SUNDAY SCHOOL CAMP TRUST
Charity Number: 515455
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLDING CAMPS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Total income: £45,659
Total expenditure: £38,498
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- Cumbria
- Doncaster
Governance
Registration history:
- 07 September 1987: Standard registration
- 20 April 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 20 April 2018: Funds transferred to 1165226 MISTERTON CHRISTIAN CENTRE
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- YORKSHIRE ASSEMBLIES SUNDAY SCHOOL CAMP (Working name)
- YORKSHIRE CHRISTIAN CAMP (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.38k | £43.27k | £43.73k | £44.52k | £45.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.69k | £39.59k | £47.03k | £39.91k | £38.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 30 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 30 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 25 November 2016 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 06 November 2016 | 6 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 28 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 28 October 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DTED 14 OCTOBER 1983 AS AMENDED 6 JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH EVANGELISM IN GENERAL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window