NEWTOWN TEXTILE MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Newtown Textile Museum is open to the public in the summer months for the education and enjoyment of its visitors. In addition to the permanent displays there are special exhibitions, demonstrations of spinning and weaving, and lectures. Visits from schools, education, and social groups are encouraged. Funds are committed to the upkeep of the building, the care, conservation of the artefacts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
Total income includes £9,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Powys
Governance
- 19 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JANET DIANA LEWIS ACSS | Chair | 19 March 2020 |
|
|||||||
Daniel Hugh Brawn | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Carrie Canham | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
James Edward Christopher Tomley | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Norman Davies | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £40.92k | £12.21k | £19.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £24.09k | £15.91k | £22.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM FOR THE EXHIBITION OF ITEMS OF ANTIQUARIAN, EDUCATIONAL, HISTORICAL OR LOCAL INTEREST INCLUDING THOSE ASSOCIATED WITH THE TEXTILE INDUSTRY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newtown Textile Museum
5-7 Commercial Street
NEWTOWN
Powys
SY16 2BL
- Phone:
- 01686622024
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window