SMILE FOR MILEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to raise money to assist the families of sick and deceased children throughout Cumbria and the North East of England. We do this by staging multiple events each year, which we encourage as many people as possible to participate in.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 09 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jake Todd | Chair | 09 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Todd | Trustee | 07 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary David Ashbridge | Trustee | 09 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Todd | Trustee | 09 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Dominic Todd | Trustee | 09 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Todd | Trustee | 09 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.14k | £10.40k | £19.87k | £15.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.95k | £10.64k | £10.56k | £1.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 February 2025 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 February 2025 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 August 2024 | 279 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 February 2025 | 460 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 April 2022 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 April 2022 | 153 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH (DIRECTLY ON IN-DIRECTLY). THE CHARITY WILL PRIMARILY FOCUS ON THE SUPPORT OF THE FAMILIES OF SICK AND DECEASED CHILDREN. WHILST THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHING ITSELF, MOST OF THE FUNDS WILL BE FORWARDED TO EXISTING CHARITIES OPERATING IN THIS FIELD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 JOHN STREET
MARYPORT
CA15 6LJ
- Phone:
- 07435606978
- Email:
- info@smileformiley.com
- Website:
-
smileformiley.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window