THE WELLBEING CO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide one to one and Group Psychosocial and Psychotherapeutic support. Deliver Mental Health and Psychoeducational training, workshops and networking Food Poverty Programme and Support to the needy. Information, Advice and Guidance Employability and capacity building support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- Enfield
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 21 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nichola Lauder | Chair | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Francia | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Knight | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.42k | £5.03k | £2.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.97k | £7.29k | £2.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.91k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 April 2023 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 April 2023 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOUNDSFIELD ROAD COMMUNITY CENTRE
8 HOUNDSFIELD ROAD
LONDON
N9 7RA
- Phone:
- 02088042068
- Email:
- Info@thewellbeingco.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window