DIVINE RENOVATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are to advance the Christian faith, particularly but not exclusively through education in the subjects of religion and church leadership including the areas of evangelism and missionary work, via formal education, conferences, online content and provision of grants to individuals who wish to attend training activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 May 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elisa Alberto | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Ekaba Roseline Davies | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Oliver Roylance-Smith | Trustee | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Daniel Jason O'Rourke | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN PURSLOW | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.33k | £194.32k | £208.77k | £244.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.33k | £160.90k | £234.96k | £205.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 DEC 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 MAR 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECTS OF RELIGION AND CHURCH LEADERSHIP INCLUDING THE AREAS OF EVANGELISM AND MISSIONARY WORK, VIA FORMAL EDUCATION, CONFERENCES, ONLINE CONTENT AND PROVISION OF GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS WHO WISH TO ATTEND TRAINING ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Divine Renovation UK
5-7 Cromwell Road
London
SW7 2HR
- Phone:
- 07576663502
- Email:
- uk@divinerenovation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window