HIGHREACH HOLIDAYS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Highreach Holiday is a week-long, residential holiday for children with moderate to severe learning difficulties that takes place each year at Highfield School during the summer holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Carey Dunn | Chair | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Olivia Jowett | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Nicholas Ringer | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Harry Peter Sproule MacCol | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Liddell | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.10k | £30.84k | £20.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.25k | £18.43k | £25.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF A LEARNING DISABILITY AND/OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A) THE ARRANGEMENT AND PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL HOLIDAYS AND OTHER RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES; AND B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING RESIDENTIAL HOLIDAY FACILITIES AND OTHER RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGHFIELD SCHOOL
HIGHFIELD LANE
LIPHOOK
GU30 7LQ
- Phone:
- 01428728000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window