HOPE & ANCHOR COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the advancement of the Christian faith in London, England, and elsewhere in the United Kingdom or abroad as the trustees may from time to time think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Spain
Governance
- 06 August 2020: CIO registration
- HOPE AND ANCHOR COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- THINK COFFEE & INK (Working name)
- THINK COFFEE AND INK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Johanna Dafne Liste | Chair | 05 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Courtney Madison Mills | Trustee | 05 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Nicole Parente | Trustee | 05 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.74k | £142.46k | £219.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.42k | £132.31k | £170.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN LONDON, ENGLAND, AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
39A CAMDEN HIGH STREET
LONDON
NW1 7JH
- Phone:
- 02076935977
- Website:
-
hopeandanchor.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window