STONEWAY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hold weekly Christian worship services in the Reading area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Reading
Governance
- 06 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Schneider | Chair | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Roh | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phil Francis Greger | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £811.88k | £392.49k | £257.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £48.29k | £481.58k | £526.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £811.88k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £48.29k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £6.39k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN READING AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
119 London Street
Reading
RG1 4QA
- Phone:
- 07852762766
- Email:
- info@stonewaychurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window