CAREY BAPTIST CHURCH, HEMEL HEMPSTEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
56 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 01 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Colin Alexander Cartwright | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Gloria Sebuliba | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
OBED SARDAR | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
HILARY CHRISTINE DONOVAN | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
RAPHAEL FEMI-OLA | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Lye | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN ISABEL MCLEOD | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN SUSAN BLUNDEN | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
COLIN WINSER HUGHES | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £49.50k | £119.52k | £186.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £66.93k | £112.87k | £147.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAREY BAPTIST CHURCH
MARLOWES
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HP1 1LD
- Phone:
- 01442256433
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window