Accounts and annual returns CYLCH MEITHRIN MWY YSGOL TWM O'R NANT

Charity number: 1187439
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 February 2025 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 03 February 2025 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 February 2024 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 February 2024 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 February 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late Download Open in new window