THE UNITY PROJECT (TUP)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We exist to support people with 'no recourse to public funds' (NRPF).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 September 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stacey Jayne Edgar | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zaki Iqbal Shah | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Brunswick | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.24k | £142.88k | £212.20k | £135.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.01k | £129.70k | £149.29k | £138.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 DEC 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 SEP 2020 as amended on 04 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG MIGRANTS DENIED RECOURSE TO PUBLIC FUNDS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING ADVICE, SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO SUCH MIGRANTS IN MAKING APPLICATIONS FOR RECOURSE TO PUBLIC FUNDS. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION, AS IT IS EXPERIENCED BY MIGRANTS DENIED ACCESS TO PUBLIC FUNDS (FOR EXAMPLE ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER AND DISABILITY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Unity
277A Upper Street
LONDON
N1 2TZ
- Phone:
- 07708214005
- Email:
- info@unity-project.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window