THE CHARLES GORDON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working to empower communities through entrepreneurial innovative projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 July 2020: CIO registration
- CGT (Working name)
- CHARLES GORDON TRUST (Previous name)
- THE CHARLES GORDON TR (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA GORDON | Chair | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Adewale Ogunnaike | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amina Frea | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Lazarus | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMAYA EMMANUEL | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £15.32k | £2.63k | £2.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £4.24k | £2.63k | £708 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH PARTS OF LONDON AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: • PROVIDING PRACTICAL AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WITH OBTAINING SECURE EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING; • PROVIDING MENTORING AND ADVOCACY SUPPORT AND A SIGNPOSTING SERVICE TO AGENCIES WHO CAN PROVIDE APPROPRIATE ADDITIONAL SUPPORT TO SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED INDIVIDUALS AND TO COMMUNITY GROUPS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED TO SUPPORT THEM. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY A MEMBER OF THE BAME COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 128
Regents House Business Centre
291 Kirkdale
London
SE26 4BD
- Phone:
- 0333 332 1895
- Email:
- INFO@CGTRUST.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window