THE EVERGREEN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity based on poverty relief projects in developing countries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Pakistan
Governance
- 28 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wajid Sohail | Chair | 05 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Muhammad Ishaq | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zafar Iqbal | Trustee | 05 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £27.18k | £13.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £7.02k | £812 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 08 July 2022 | 153 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
ÔTO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SEES FIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: I. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. II. TO RELIEVE POVERTY [OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP] AMONG REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS, MIGRANT WORKERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS LIVING ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING INTERPRETING/TRANSLATING/ADVOCACY/HEALTH/HOUSING ADVICE AND EDUCATION. III. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY [OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP] ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. IV. TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY THROUGH UNDERTAKING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO FACTORS THAT CONTRIBUTE TO POVERTY AND THE MOST APPROPRIATE WAYS TO MITIGATE THESE. V. TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF YOUNG AND OLD PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN HEALTHY RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES THAT THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 WESTBOURNE ROAD
LUTON
LU4 8JD
- Phone:
- 07708290587
- Email:
- faizanazmin@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window