KINGS CHURCH WOKINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion, to relieve poverty and those in need by reason of social or health issues and to advance education for children or adults within the principles of the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wokingham
Governance
- 07 July 2020: CIO registration
- 07 February 2022: Funds received from 1077523 KINGS CHURCH WOKINGHAM
- KINGS CHURCH WOKINGHAM TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Michael Randall | Chair | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Henry George | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Davies | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ross Macrow | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Chong | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annette Davies | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.97k | £95.58k | £124.29k | £103.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.84k | £90.68k | £121.42k | £105.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 4.1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH; 4.2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF SOCIAL OR HEALTH ISSUES, FOR EXAMPLE ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, UNEMPLOYMENT OR SUCH OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 4.3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BOTH GENERAL AND VOCATIONAL FOR CHILDREN OR ADULTS WITHIN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 4.4. TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY;
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGS CHURCH WOKINGHAM
KINGS PLACE
9-11 STATION ROAD
WOKINGHAM
RG40 2AD
- Phone:
- 07838197731
- Email:
- admin@kingschurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window