SPORTIN MS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sportin MS was set up on 1st September 2019, as a small interest charity to raise funds to assist in the support and care of persons suffering from Multiple Sclerosis or in need of rehabilitation as a result of such illness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
- Suffolk
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Antoinette Helen Bunyan | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Ian Jardine | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Calvin Lloyd Bunyan | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.15k | £14.67k | £14.50k | £14.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.90k | £5.89k | £7.07k | £5.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE - TO ASSIST IN THE SUPPORT, TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SPORT, ACTIVITY AND RECREATION; - TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS IN SOUTH EAST ENGLAND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE; AND - TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 BRAKEY HILL
BLETCHINGLEY
REDHILL
RH1 4PT
- Phone:
- 01883744078
- Email:
- sportinms@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window