BUDLEIGH COMMUNITY WORKSHOP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BCWT will provide community workshop facilities for the broadest possible range of local people in Budleigh Salterton and the surrounding area. A key objective is to bring the community together to the benefit of both the volunteers running the wide range of activities within the workshop and those participating in these activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 11 March 2020: CIO registration
- BUDLEIGH COMMUNITY WORKSHOP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William McDermott | Chair | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edmund George Shiels | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Geoffrey Alan Norman | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Alan Fetherston | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Pilkington | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Antony Alton | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ralph Bingham | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robert Maycock | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £425.93k | £38.67k | £30.34k | £44.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.66k | £54.20k | £25.54k | £25.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 March 2022 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS IN BUDLEIGH SALTERTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Budleigh Community Workshop Trust
The Old Fire Station
Station Road
Budleigh Salterton
EX9 6RJ
- Phone:
- 01395443455
- Email:
- Bill.w.mcdermott@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window