ST MARY'S ABBEY CHAPEL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Upkeep of St Mary's Abbey Colwich Church. Maintenance of chaplain. Grants to organisations for relief of poverty and advancement of Roman Catholic Religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 15 August 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVINA CHRISTINE ANNE SHARP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Father Jeremy Anthony Sierla | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PEGGY ANN ROWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.92k | £22.87k | £23.83k | £28.64k | £25.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.23k | £19.88k | £18.80k | £20.01k | £17.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 259 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 259 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 MAY 1983
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FOR ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (A) FOR THE MAINTENANCE REPAIR, UPKEEP OF THE PUBLIC CHAPEL AT ST MARY'S ABBEY, (B) PAYING THE STIPEND OR OTHER REMUNERATION OF ANY PRIEST OFFICIATING AT CEREMONY (C) PROVIDING REPAIRING OR MAINTAINING ANY ARTICLE NECESSARY OR PROPER FOR THE CEREMONIES, (D) FOR RELIEVING POVERTY BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM EXPEDIENT, (E) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BEING CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
STANBROOK ABBEY
WASS
YORK
YO61 4AY
- Phone:
- 01347868900
- Email:
- marysabbey@btopenworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window