STROUD VILLAGE HALL AND RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1188440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To establish, or secure the establishment, of a Village Hall ("the Hall") and to maintain and manage the same (whether alone or in co-operation with any local authority or other person or body) in furtherance of the organisation's objects for the benefit of the inhabitants of the village of Stroud, Hampshire and surrounding areas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £41,939
Total expenditure: £43,833

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 March 2020: CIO registration
  • 03 May 2023: Funds received from 1082925 STROUD VILLAGE HALL AND RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Andrew Rogers Chair 04 February 2020
None on record
Kat Wooton Trustee 07 May 2024
None on record
Sally Wedley Trustee 06 June 2023
None on record
Oliver Simon Howe Trustee 04 February 2020
None on record
Natasha Finn Trustee 04 February 2020
None on record
Christopher John Snow Trustee 04 February 2020
None on record
Glenys Wellstead Trustee 04 February 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £30.67k £41.94k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £33.45k £43.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £6.42k £13.72k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Stroud Village Hall
Stroudfields
Stroud
Petersfield
GU32 3FS
Phone:
07915092660