HOSPITAL RADIO BEDSIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hospital Radio Bedside Broadcasts to 5 local Hospitals, Royal Bournemouth, Christchurch, Wimborne, Poole and Poole Maternity. team volunteers who act in various roles within our association whether that be radio presenters or hospital visitors. collecting,playing patients requests, ensure that their stay in Hospital is as relaxed and personal as possible , this should aid patients recovery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 01 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Plummer | Chair | 04 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Marlor | Trustee | 29 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Neville John Hepburn | Trustee | 29 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Elisabeth Kite | Trustee | 29 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Judith Adda | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Diaper | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SCOTT | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.96k | £8.15k | £20.76k | £12.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.96k | £15.10k | £18.93k | £11.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, POOR HEALTH AND OLD AGE AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN BOURNEMOUTH, POOLE AND EAST DORSET BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS, RESIDENTIAL HOMES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS, AND FOR PATIENTS RECEIVING COMMUNITY CARE; AND, (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE BENEFITS OF LIVING A HEALTHY LIFESTYLE, AND THE IMPORTANCE OF MAINTAINING GOOD PERSONAL MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH BY (MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE MEANS OF BROADCASTING HEALTH EDUCATION MESSAGES TO PEOPLE LIVING IN BOURNEMOUTH, POOLE AND EAST DORSET .
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL BOURNEMOUTH HOSPITAL
CASTLE LANE EAST
BOURNEMOUTH
BH7 7DW
- Phone:
- 01202303887
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window