Financial history SACHKHAND NANAK DHAM INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 515484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £86.64k £106.37k £105.25k £109.53k £90.17k
Total expenditure £51.14k £59.95k £63.63k £72.00k £75.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.59k £265 N/A N/A N/A