Trustees CYLCH MEITHRIN MACHYNLLETH

Charity number: 1187512
Charity reporting is up to date (73 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tamsin Elizabeth Cathan Davies Chair 19 January 2021
None on record
Elena Blackmore Trustee 08 April 2025
None on record
GWENAN JONES PHILLIPS Trustee 08 October 2024
None on record
Sian-Anwen Calban Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Edwina Mansell Wilkes Trustee 01 March 2022
CANOLFAN PENNAL CYF
Received: On time
BRO DDYFI PIANO FUND
Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days
Carys Jones Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
Tomi Glyn Rowlands Trustee 19 May 2021
None on record