FRIENDS OF CATFORTH SCHOOL

Charity number: 1188050
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide extra equipment to enhance learning.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £5,553
Total expenditure: £3,003

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 February 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katrina Scott Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Megan Brown Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Michelle Hindmoor Trustee 15 November 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £3.64k £4.02k £6.79k £5.55k
Total expenditure £931 £2.40k £14.65k £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CATFORTH PRIMARY SCHOOL
SCHOOL LANE
CATFORTH
PRESTON
PR4 0HL
Phone:
01772690451