Trustees LITTLE CHICKS NURSERY PLUS
Charity number: 1187967

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Rose Thomas | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Maelor Griffiths | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Murray Holmes | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Emma Jones | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Tina Davies | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linzi Jade Powell | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sian Wilson | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Mary Craig | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joel Russell Kernahan Moore | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Ann Jones | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.