WESTMINSTER SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide information, advice, skills and training opportunities for refugees, migrants and locals. Delivering projects that promote community cohesion, integration, reduce barriers between different communities and improve access to services in London borough of Westminster. Deliver tuition classes in subjects of Maths, Science, English and Arabic language classes for children aged between 5-15.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 December 2023
Total income includes £31,783 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 July 2020: CIO registration
- FOR A BETTER WORLD (FBW) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yawooz Izzat | Chair | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ismail Oyzoyn | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ertugrul Salichoglou | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/12/2021 | 04/12/2022 | 04/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.82k | £18.00k | £37.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.46k | £17.00k | £38.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.02k | N/A | £31.78k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AGED BETWEEN 5 AND 15 IN WESTMINSTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS ON THE SUBJECTS OF MATHEMATICS, LITERACY AND ENGLISH, ARABIC AND ISLAMIC STUDIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING A SUPPLEMENTARY SATURDAY AND SUNDAY SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 24
Baltimore Court
70 Vauxhall Bridge Road
LONDON
SW1V 2RP
- Phone:
- 07888735602
- Email:
- fabetterworld@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window