KINKIIZI DIOCESE EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs and advance education and promote good health among the poor, destitute or orphaned children of Kinkiizi Anglican Diocese, Uganda, through the provision of School Fees, costs of Vocational Training, University Fees and any other type of Educational Fees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Uganda
Governance
- 04 February 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Canon Marvin John Bamforth | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Milton Bamforth | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Price | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.90k | £6.47k | £3.20k | £2.40k | £967 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.83k | £280 | £0 | £32.67k | £90 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AMONG THE POOR, DESTITUTE OR ORPHANED CHILDREN OF KINKIIZI ANGLICAN DIOCESE, UGANDA, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SCHOOL FEES, COST OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING, UNIVERSITY FEES AND ANY OTHER TYPE OF EDUCATIONAL FEE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Ellis Drive
MORECAMBE
Lancashire
LA4 6DN
- Phone:
- 07922562866
- Email:
- marvinandsue72@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window