Accounts and annual returns SWYTHAMLEY AND HEATON CENTRE

Charity number: 515499
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2011 17 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2011 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2010 29 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2010 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2009 02 January 2010 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2009 28 January 2010 31 days late