MARKET HARBOROUGH HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote public education in the study and research of the history and archaeology of Market Harborough and district (approx. 10 mile radius) by collection, collation and dissemination of information by, holding lectures, discussions and visits. undertaking historical and archaeological studies. maintaining and augmenting the collections. promoting the publication of historical information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 24 August 1984: Standard registration
- 02 May 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 02 May 2017: Funds transferred to 1157244 MARKET HARBOROUGH HISTORICAL SOCIETY CIO
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.12k | £6.17k | £5.09k | £3.54k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.97k | £5.24k | £4.56k | £3.60k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 10 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 14 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 21 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 15 March 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 10 MARCH 1982.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE STUDY AND RESEARCH OF ARCHAEOLOGY AND HISTORY OF MARKET HARBOROUGH AND DISTRICT. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
MARKET HARBOROUGH DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.