MOTHER - THE ORPHAN HERITAGE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Serving orphans is our greatest objective. We endeavour to better their lives holistically by providing them with much needed, critical aid as well as opportunities that enhance their daily living experience. Additionally we aim to provide support for children and members of the wider community in times of conflict and natural disasters. We operate in the UK and across the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Somalia
- Syria
- The Gambia
- Yemen
Governance
- 04 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohsin Hashmi | Chair | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Imran Hussain | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sadaat Malik | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.04k | £21.45k | £28.76k | £86.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.98k | £20.62k | £24.87k | £76.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2023 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2023 | 363 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR ORPHANS LIVING IN GAMBIA AND PAKISTAN AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, FINANCIAL AID, MEDICAL TREATMENT AND EDUCATION ABOUT THE PREVENTION OF DISEASE AND THE HEALTH RISKS OF POOR HYGIENE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 HATCHLANDS
GREAT HOLM
MILTON KEYNES
MK8 9DN
- Phone:
- 07578705384
- Email:
- info@mother-tohf.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window