SHE-UNITY SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to break the barriers that hold back BME women, such as racial and gender discrimination, cultural stigmas, and economic challenges. We aim to empower women in Essex and the surrounding areas through a comprehensive approach encompassing culturally sensitive support services, advocacy, education, community engagement and leadership development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barking And Dagenham
- Bexley
- Essex
- Havering
- Kent
- Thurrock
Governance
- 27 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tsitsi Rose Mhuriro | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Janga | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prieska Chimhini | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.00k | £862 | £0 | £1.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.32k | £1.32k | £0 | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 26 June 2023 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 26 June 2023 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 May 2022 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 18 May 2022 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Apr 2020 as amended on 25 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO BME WOMEN WHO HAVE SUFFERED ABUSE BY THE PROVISION OF EMOTIONAL SUPPORT, FREE LEGAL ADVICE AND RAISING AWARENESS OF DIFFERENT FORMS OF ABUSE, EMPOWERING THEM FOR LONG TERM RECOVERY TO IMPROVE THEIR MENTAL WELL-BEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14a Baddow Park
West Hanningfield Road
Great Baddow
Chelmsford
CM2 7SY
- Phone:
- 07365 369369343
- Email:
- info@sheunitysupport.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window