EVESHAM MEN IN SHEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EMiS provides a physical space, tools and equipment, encouragement and training to carry out various activities such as small woodworking projects, community projects, gardening and social activities. Catchment area is Evesham and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 10 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Warren Percival | Chair | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Colin Jackson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Derek Blackmore | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard David Styles | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Huttlestone | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.56k | £1.58k | £1.96k | £7.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.69k | £4.80k | £2.23k | £2.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.71k | N/A | N/A | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING GENERALLY OLDER (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OLDER) PEOPLE RESIDING IN EVESHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY BY PROVIDING A PLACE AND FACILITIES WHERE THEY CAN MEET OTHERS AND UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, RECREATIONAL OR PHYSICAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN AND PASS ON SKILLS, GAIN CONFIDENCE AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY AND MENTALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: LONELINESS, ISOLATION, UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; OLD AGE; MENTAL ILL HEALTH; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; BEREAVEMENT OR RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Evesham Men in Sheds
CORNMILL ROAD
EVESHAM
WR11 2LL
- Phone:
- 07467281361
- Email:
- evesham.mis@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window