MIND OVER MOUNTAINS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mind Over Mountains is a charity restoring well-being naturally through life-changing therapeutic outdoor experiences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 August 2020: CIO registration
- MIND OVER MOUNTAINS CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline White | Chair | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Olivia D'Silva | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Norris | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Celia Jeffreys | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Garry Pratt | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Abiola Aderibigbe | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Howarth | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Whitehead | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Smith | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giles Thurston | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Houghton | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER STANIFORTH | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.87k | £123.74k | £91.28k | £242.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.33k | £109.07k | £111.93k | £215.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Aug 2020 as amended on 12 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND MINDFULNESS ACTIVITIES, INCLUDING ACCREDITED ACTIVITIES AND SUPPORT IN OUTDOOR ENVIRONMENTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 Bryants Acre
Wendover
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP22 6LA
- Phone:
- 07818803556
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window