ASK FOR JAKE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASK FOR JAKE PROVIDES A NETWORK OF TRAINED VOLUNTEERS WHO ARE ABLE TO OFFER EMOTIONAL SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS IN DISTRESS WHERE REQUIRED, IN THE FORM OF TALKING THERAPY, DESIGNED TO PROVIDE INFORMAL EARLY INTERVENTION TO MINIMISE ESCALATION OF MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS. CURRENTLY OFFERING FREE MENTAL HEALTH AWARENESS TRAINING, A WEEKLY' DROP IN' SESSION AND ONLINE TEXT SUPPORT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 09 April 2020: CIO registration
- AFJ (Working name)
- ASK FOR JAKE CIO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marie Ash | Chair | 09 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Phoebe Ward | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linzi mcphail | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Rice | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Squire | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.94k | £21.53k | £32.57k | £43.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.08k | £11.02k | £19.89k | £30.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 17 April 2022 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 17 April 2022 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH IN BRAUNTON, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) PROVIDING A NETWORK OF TRAINED VOLUNTEERS WHO ARE ABLE TO OFFER EMOTIONAL SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS IN DISTRESS WHERE REQUIRED, IN THE FORM OF TALKING THERAPY, DESIGNED TO PROVIDE INFORMAL EARLY INTERVENTION TO MINIMISE ESCALATION OF MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS. (B) PROVIDING A SIGNPOSTING SERVICE TO SUPPORT MENTAL HEALTH WELLBEING.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
2A FIELD CLOSE
BRAUNTON
EX33 1EP
- Phone:
- 07931019281
- Email:
- askforjakebraunton@gmail.com
- Website:
-
askforjake.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window