HULL SCRAPSTORE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance arts and crafts by facilitating the provision of recycled scrap and surplus materials as a creative resource for adults and children with the aim of improving their social welfare and mental health and wellbeing. To facilitate creative art and training workshops for children and adults using these materials. To support likeminded artists and community groups in the local area and beyond
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 March 2020: CIO registration
- 04 November 2022: Funds received from 1039383 THE HULL PLAY RESOURCE CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Humble | Chair | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Binnington | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
Joanne Pullen | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Adamson | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|||||||
Abigail Bell | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £88.05k | £282.76k | £165.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £45.14k | £181.35k | £169.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.00k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE ARTS AND CRAFTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) FACILITATING THE USE AND PROVISION OF RECYCLED, SCRAP OR SURPLUS MATERIALS AS A CREATIVE RESOURCE TO ADULTS AND CHILDREN WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING; AND BY (B) INSPIRING INDIVIDUAL AND GROUP CREATIVITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ENVIRONMENT. (2) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROMOTING RECYCLING, USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS AND THE USE OF SURPLUS OR SCRAP; AND BY: (B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT WASTE RECYCLING AND USE OF SURPLUS OR SCRAP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HULL SCRAPSTORE
DAIRYCOATES AVENUE
HULL
HU3 5DB
- Phone:
- 01482328750
- Email:
- admin@hullscrapstore.org.uk
- Website:
-
scrapstorehull.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window