ZULEKHA ZINGA WELFARE TRUST

Charity Number: 1188663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship anywhere in the world by providing or assisting in the provision of education, training, healthcare projects and all the necessary support designed to enable individuals to generate a sustainable income and be self-sufficient.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £57,938
Total expenditure: £65,934

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 March 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
YUNUS ZINGA Chair 19 March 2020
None on record
Idrish Bhaloda Trustee 16 August 2022
None on record
Ridwan Mohammed Suleman Trustee 16 August 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £56.39k £14.24k £38.06k £57.94k
Total expenditure £48.72k £20.47k £17.56k £65.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 May 2024 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 May 2024 99 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 LOWTHORPE CRESCENT
PRESTON
PR1 6YE
Phone:
07977785786
Website:

WWW.ZINGATRUST.COM