CHESTER PHOTOGRAPHIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Photographic lectures, competitions and demonstrations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 02 October 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Arthur Jones | Chair | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Dixon | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donna Ann Hughes | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Forrester Nixon | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Sawallisch | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Owen Gwyn Watkins | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Champion | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Turner | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Keith John Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANICE WILDING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MELVILLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.28k | £1.99k | £2.06k | £2.54k | £2.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.57k | £1.15k | £1.98k | £2.59k | £2.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MAY 1984
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE THEORY AND PRACTICE OF PHOTOGRAPHY AS AN ART.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Boydell Way
Dodleston
Chester
CH4 9NR
- Phone:
- 01244660278
- Email:
- secretary@chesterps.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window