Suicide Prevention UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Suicide Prevention UK is a charity that helps anyone with thoughts of suicide via telephone (National Suicide Prevention Helpline UK), social media & out in the community. We use our training in crisis intervention to offer supportive listening to start a dialogue and to encourage more hopeful solutions than suicide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 February 2020: CIO registration
- National Suicide Prevention Helpline UK (Working name)
- Suicide Prevention UK (Working name)
- SUICIDE PREVENTION BRISTOL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosie Smith | Trustee | 22 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sue Starr | Trustee | 22 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Williams | Trustee | 22 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Young | Trustee | 22 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tristan Easter | Trustee | 18 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Hayward | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/01/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.52k | £276.00k | £252.43k | £378.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.43k | £179.24k | £244.37k | £283.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £11.53k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 January 2021 | 08 December 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 January 2021 | 30 December 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Feb 2020 as amended on 08 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THOSE EXPERIENCING DISTRESS / DESPAIR AND / OR THOSE AT RISK OF SUICIDE THROUGH CONFIDENTIAL EMOTIONAL SUPPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUICIDE PREVENTION
SUITE 601
179 WHITELADIES ROAD
BRISTOL
- Phone:
- 08005870800
- Email:
- info@spuk.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window