THE MAGIC COTTAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support children and young adults (under 25 ) and their families, by arranging access to free short break holidays and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Blaenau Gwent
- Monmouthshire
- Powys
- Torfaen
Governance
- 28 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Reynolds | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angelica Mary Meletiou | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £349.07k | £264.97k | £346.09k | £422.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £204.08k | £252.88k | £350.90k | £430.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £63.62k | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jul 2020 as amended on 01 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN OR YOUNG PEOPLE, WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS OR SERIOUS ILLNESS EITHER CHRONIC OR LIFE LIMITING, AND THEIR FAMILIES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY PROVIDING ACTIVITIES, AND/OR HOLIDAY ACCOMMODATION, FOR THE WHOLE FAMILY, FREE OF CHARGE AND PARTICULARLY FOCUSING ON THOSE FAMILIES THAT WOULD BE UNABLE TO FINANCE THESE ACTIVITIES THEMSELVES. THIS WILL INITIALLY BE FOR FAMILIES LIVING WITHIN THE COUNTIES OF MONMOUTHSHIRE, BLAENAU GWENT, TORFAEN AND POWYS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Magic Cottage Charity
The Old HSBC Bank
2 Frogmore Street
ABERGAVENNY
Monmouthshire
NP7 5AF
- Phone:
- 07815099736
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window