BENEFIT MANKIND LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Benefit Mankind is an international aid relief and development organisation located in the United Kingdom. We are a global humanitarian & development organisation here to serve mankind. We aim to improve lives, alleviate poverty, transform and empower local communities whilst championing humanity, impartiality, neutrality and independence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£5,065,434
Donations and legacies | £4.76m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £307.39k |
Total expenditure:
£5,088,838
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £5.09m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.09m |
People

1 Employee(s)
2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
- India
- Indonesia
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Malawi
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Sierra Leone
- Sri Lanka
- Yemen
Governance
- 10 February 2020: Standard registration
- BENEFIT MANKIND (Previous name)
- BENEFIT MANKIND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Talha Mulla | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rizwan Ismail Gharda | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.13m | £2.70m | £2.63m | £5.07m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.04m | £2.59m | £2.71m | £5.09m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.02m | £2.44m | £2.37m | £4.76m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £110.76k | £267.56k | £257.32k | £307.39k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.01m | £2.59m | £2.71m | £5.09m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.47k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.00k | £7.20k | £9.51k | £6.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £999.89k | £0 | £0 | £4.94m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £30.13k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.77k | £3.61k | £31.81k | £24.14k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £93.45k | £207.29k | £134.20k | £118.87k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.00k | £7.20k | £8.20k | £8.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JAN 2020 as amended on 06 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT FOR MUSLIM AND OTHER COMMUNITIES WORLDWIDE: A.THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR, THE SUPPORT OF INHABITANTS OF COUNTRIES AND REGIONS AFFECTED DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY BY WAR, CIVIL COMMOTION, DISEASE AND NATURAL AND OTHER DISASTERS; B.THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER NEED; C.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR, EDUCATION PROVIDED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF ISLAM; AND D.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH; AND, IN FURTHERING THE OBJECTS, THE CHARITY SHALL OPERATE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 1
Blackburn Enterprise Centre
Furthergate
BLACKBURN
BB1 3HQ
- Phone:
- 01254602598
- Email:
- info@benefitmankind.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window