PEPPER STREET FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1190660
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Pepper Street Foundation is a UK based charity that works with deprived communities to identify opportunities for pioneering projects that change lives by providing funding and guidance for inspired 'social marketing' projects that apply the latest marketing thinking to shift mindsets and allow individuals and communities to access the contacts and resources they need to pilot new initiatives.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £1,158
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 July 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Segar Reddy Phd Chair 11 March 2020
None on record
Chris Foreshew Trustee 11 March 2020
None on record
Slobodan Marceta Trustee 11 March 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £100 £1.44k £1.16k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 17 July 2024 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 17 July 2024 47 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 22 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 14 November 2022 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 14 November 2022 167 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1A CARLTON ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 7RZ
Phone:
07712937443
Website:

pepperstreetfoundation.com