DULWICH AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of local study groups, support and enable study days and also monthly talks in a wide range of subjects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
110 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 13 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Finola Maeve Norah Stack | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Mark Friedman | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Abrahams | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Northover | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Helen Hensby | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Pagan | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Elizabeth Chessell | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Mary Bairstow | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Martyn Ball | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Knapp | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Virginia Robertson | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Sharpley | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.67k | £9.80k | £10.73k | £16.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.30k | £9.10k | £11.37k | £10.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Mar 2020 as amended on 23 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rosebery Lodge
Dulwich Park
Dulwich Common
London
SE21 7EX
- Phone:
- 020 8670 5975
- Email:
- secretary@dulwich-u3a.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window