THE CANAL BOAT ADVENTURE PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CANAL BOAT ADVENTURE PROJECT ADDRESSES POVERTY AND DISADVANTAGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CANAL BOATS FOR YOUTH SERVICES, SCHOOLS AND YOUTH ORGANISATIONS, FOR SOCIAL EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL PURPOSES. THE PROJECT ALSO OPERATES A CANAL BOAT BASED SOCIAL INCLUSION PROJECT FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE AT RISK, VULNERABLE OR FAILING TO ACHIEVE THEIR POTENTIAL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Total income includes £15,844 from government contract(s) and £4,828 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Warrington
- Wirral
Governance
- 25 September 1984: Standard registration
- 27 October 2016: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 27 October 2016: Funds transferred to 1169009 CANAL BOAT ADVENTURE PROJECT LTD
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.10k | £265.68k | £196.12k | £203.79k | £188.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.44k | £229.61k | £238.84k | £225.79k | £159.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.84k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 14 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 14 April 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 30 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 30 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 31 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 31 October 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 09 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 09 July 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/03/1984 AS AMENDED ON 04/09/2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23/10/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF CBAP ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE THE SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN CHESHIRE AND MERSEYSIDE (“THE BENEFICIARIES”) BY THE PROVISION, OPERATION AND USE OF CANAL BOATS, YOUTH FACILITIES AND/OR YOUTH RELATED SUPPORT, RECREATIONAL AND/OR EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS.
Area of benefit
CHESHIRE AND MERSEYSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window