REGENERATE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making it easier to start, grow and lead a purpose-driven business
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 September 2020: Standard registration
- REGENERATE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Francis Anthony Isaacs | Chair | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Swaithes | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arjuna Gihan Fernando MBE | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Richard Rudi Brass | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Devina Marylyn Paul | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £318.65k | £339.40k | £351.39k | £418.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £221.73k | £301.57k | £352.35k | £374.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.97k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 DEC 2019 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15 JAN 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
2.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: 2.1.1 ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION IN THE SUBJECTS OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND RESPONSIBLE AND PURPOSEFUL BUSINESS AND TO PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH; AND 2.1.2 PROMOTE ETHICAL STANDARDS AND CONDUCT IN BUSINESS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND ADVICE TO PURPOSE-DRIVEN BUSINESSES AND ENCOURAGING THE ADOPTION AND APPLICATION OF HIGH STANDARDS OF BUSINESS ETHICS AND GOVERNANCE AND THEREBY: (A) MAXIMISING THE MATERIAL POSITIVE IMPACT OF BUSINESS ACTIVITIES ON PEOPLE AND THE ENVIRONMENT AFFECTED BY SUCH ACTIVITIES; AND (B) MINIMISING THE NEGATIVE EFFECTS OF BUSINESS ACTIVITIES ON PEOPLE AND THE ENVIRONMENT AFFECTED BY SUCH ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fivefields
8-10 Grosvenor Gardens
LONDON
SW1W 0DH
- Phone:
- 07775580210
- Email:
- info@re-generate.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window