Trustees MEN IN SHEDS HALTEMPRICE
Charity Number: 1188076

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen John Dodsworth | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Malcolm Brunning | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Carter | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Scott | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hill | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Carter | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Rose Hardy | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Margaret Rice | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Frederick Woodcock | Trustee | 01 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
Alan James Bright | Trustee | 01 March 2000 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.