Trustees MEN WALK TALK

Charity number: 1188361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Thomas Acott Chair 30 March 2023
None on record
Zach Beckett Trustee 11 April 2025
None on record
James Christopher Abdool Trustee 09 February 2023
None on record
Taylor Charles Pryer-Freeman Trustee 13 September 2022
None on record
RODNEY SCOTT PETER FUNNELL Trustee 04 December 2021
None on record
Michael James Jenkins Trustee 01 November 2020
None on record